Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB114 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: McClendon, Alvarado, King of Taylor H.B. No. 114
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 17, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating April as Minority Cancer Awareness Month.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.108 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.108.  MINORITY CANCER AWARENESS MONTH. (a) April
 is Minority Cancer Awareness Month to increase awareness of cancer
 in minority populations and encourage funding of education and
 earlier and more effective diagnosis and treatment of cancer.
 (b)  Minority Cancer Awareness Month shall be regularly
 observed by appropriate activities in public locations to increase
 cancer awareness, including the specific effects, incidences, and
 impact of cancer on minority populations, and encourage support for
 minority cancer education, diagnosis, treatment, and prevention.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *