Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1148 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Smith of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1148
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 13, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption for certain disabled veterans from the
 payment of a fee for the issuance of a personal identification
 certificate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.426(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a veteran of
 service in the armed forces of the United States is exempt from the
 payment of fees under this chapter for the issuance of a driver's
 license or personal identification certificate if the veteran:
 (1)  was honorably discharged;
 (2)  has a service-related disability of at least 60
 percent; and
 (3)  receives compensation from the United States
 because of the disability.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *