House | 04/11/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 569 | Journal Page: 1652 |
House | 04/05/2011 | Postponed | 4/11/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1498 |
House | 04/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1498 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 554 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 554 | |
House | 02/09/2011 | Filed |