Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#310
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#302
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Castro
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1588
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1588
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1588
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2011
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
House
|
02/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|