Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB125 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Legler, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Jackson) H.B. No. 125
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
33 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
44 Natural Resources; May 24, 2011, reported adversely, with
55 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8,
66 Nays 0; May 24, 2011, sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 125 By: Hegar
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the regulatory analysis of rules proposed by the Texas
1313 Commission on Environmental Quality.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 5, Water Code, is amended
1616 by adding Section 5.1031 to read as follows:
1717 Sec. 5.1031. ADOPTION OF ENVIRONMENTAL RULES. (a) In this
1818 section:
1919 (1) "Cost" means a reasonably identifiable,
2020 significant, and direct or indirect economic impact.
2121 (2) "Environmental effect" means a reasonably
2222 identifiable and quantifiable effect or outcome affecting the
2323 environment or human health.
2424 (3) "Environmental rule" means a rule the specific
2525 intent of which is to protect the environment or reduce risks to
2626 human health from environmental exposure.
2727 (4) "Small business" means a business that employs not
2828 more than 250 individuals.
2929 (b) Before adopting an environmental rule, the commission
3030 shall conduct a regulatory analysis that identifies the costs and
3131 environmental effects expected to result from implementation of and
3232 compliance with the rule.
3333 (c) When giving notice of an environmental rule, the
3434 commission shall incorporate into the fiscal note required by
3535 Section 2001.024, Government Code, a draft impact analysis
3636 describing the anticipated effects of the proposed rule. The draft
3737 impact analysis, at a minimum, must:
3838 (1) identify the problem the rule is intended to
3939 address;
4040 (2) identify the environmental effects that the agency
4141 expects to result from implementation of and compliance with the
4242 rule, including the projected level of reduction of pollutants or
4343 contaminants in air, water, and soil media;
4444 (3) identify and describe the costs that the agency
4545 expects that state agencies, local governments, the public, and the
4646 affected regulated entities, other than small businesses, will
4747 incur from implementation of and compliance with the rule; and
4848 (4) identify and describe in a separate economic
4949 impact analysis the costs that the agency expects that small
5050 businesses will incur from implementation of and compliance with
5151 the rule.
5252 (d) In identifying the environmental effects of a rule under
5353 Subsection (c)(2), the commission shall include the modeled
5454 improvement for the criteria pollutant design value expected from
5555 implementation of the rule, if the rule will be included in the
5656 state implementation plan.
5757 (e) After considering public comments submitted under
5858 Section 2001.029, Government Code, and determining that a proposed
5959 rule should be adopted, the agency shall prepare a final regulatory
6060 analysis that complies with Section 2001.033, Government Code.
6161 (f) A person who submitted a comment in accordance with
6262 Section 2001.029, Government Code, may challenge the validity of an
6363 environmental rule that is not proposed and adopted in strict
6464 compliance with the procedural requirements of this section by
6565 filing an action for declaratory judgment as provided by Section
6666 2001.038, Government Code, not later than the 30th day after the
6767 effective date of the rule. If the court determines that an
6868 environmental rule was not proposed and adopted in strict
6969 compliance with the procedural requirements of this section, the
7070 rule is invalid.
7171 (g) The requirements of this section may not be construed so
7272 as to cause a delay or to prevent the timely implementation of any
7373 federal requirements.
7474 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
7575 to a rule proposed by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
7676 for which notice is given under Sections 2001.023 and 2001.024,
7777 Government Code, on or after December 1, 2011.
7878 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
7979 * * * * *