Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2317 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1103 | Journal Page: 3961 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3961 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3961 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3960 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3582 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3582 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3229 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3229 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Postponed | 5/9/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3138 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2697 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2697 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Postponed | 5/3/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2239 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2239 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 557 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 557 | |
House | 02/10/2011 | Filed |