|
06/16/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
E
|
05/16/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3826
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3650
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
House
|
02/10/2011
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|