Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#955
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|