Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB13 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Kolkhorst, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 13
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2011;
33 May 13, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
44 and Human Services; May 20, 2011, reported adversely, with
55 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
66 Nays 4; May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 13 By: Nelson
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the Medicaid program and alternate methods of providing
1313 health services to low-income persons in this state.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Subtitle I, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
1616 by adding Chapter 536 to read as follows:
1717 CHAPTER 536. MEDICAID REFORM WAIVER
1818 Sec. 536.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1919 (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
2020 Commission.
2121 (2) "Executive commissioner" means the executive
2222 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
2323 Sec. 536.002. FEDERAL AUTHORIZATION FOR MEDICAID REFORM.
2424 (a) The executive commissioner shall seek a waiver under Section
2525 1115 of the federal Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1315) to
2626 the state Medicaid plan.
2727 (b) The waiver under this section must be designed to
2828 achieve the following objectives regarding the Medicaid program and
2929 alternatives to the program:
3030 (1) provide flexibility to determine Medicaid
3131 eligibility categories and income levels;
3232 (2) provide flexibility to design Medicaid benefits
3333 that meet the demographic, public health, clinical, and cultural
3434 needs of this state or regions within this state;
3535 (3) encourage use of the private health benefits
3636 coverage market rather than public benefits systems;
3737 (4) encourage people who have access to private
3838 employer-based health benefits to obtain or maintain those
3939 benefits;
4040 (5) create a culture of shared financial
4141 responsibility, accountability, and participation in the Medicaid
4242 program by:
4343 (A) establishing and enforcing copayment
4444 requirements similar to private sector principles for all
4545 eligibility groups;
4646 (B) promoting the use of health savings accounts
4747 to influence a culture of individual responsibility; and
4848 (C) promoting the use of vouchers for
4949 consumer-directed services in which consumers manage and pay for
5050 health-related services provided to them using program vouchers;
5151 (6) consolidate federal funding streams, including
5252 funds from the disproportionate share hospitals and upper payment
5353 limit supplemental payment programs and other federal Medicaid
5454 funds, to ensure the most effective and efficient use of those
5555 funding streams;
5656 (7) allow flexibility in the use of state funds used to
5757 obtain federal matching funds, including allowing the use of
5858 intergovernmental transfers, certified public expenditures, costs
5959 not otherwise matchable, or other funds and funding mechanisms to
6060 obtain federal matching funds;
6161 (8) empower individuals who are uninsured to acquire
6262 health benefits coverage through the promotion of cost-effective
6363 coverage models that provide access to affordable primary,
6464 preventive, and other health care on a sliding scale, with fees paid
6565 at the point of service; and
6666 (9) allow for the redesign of long-term care services
6767 and supports to increase access to person-centered care in the most
6868 cost-effective manner.
6969 SECTION 2. (a) In this section:
7070 (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
7171 Commission.
7272 (2) "FMAP" means the federal medical assistance
7373 percentage by which state expenditures under the Medicaid program
7474 are matched with federal funds.
7575 (3) "Illegal immigrant" means an individual who is not
7676 a citizen or national of the United States and who is unlawfully
7777 present in the United States.
7878 (4) "Medicaid program" means the medical assistance
7979 program under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code.
8080 (b) The commission shall actively pursue a modification to
8181 the formula prescribed by federal law for determining this state's
8282 FMAP to achieve a formula that would produce an FMAP that accounts
8383 for and is periodically adjusted to reflect changes in the
8484 following factors in this state:
8585 (1) the total population;
8686 (2) the population growth rate; and
8787 (3) the percentage of the population with household
8888 incomes below the federal poverty level.
8989 (c) The commission shall pursue the modification as
9090 required by Subsection (b) of this section by providing to the Texas
9191 delegation to the United States Congress and the federal Centers
9292 for Medicare and Medicaid Services and other appropriate federal
9393 agencies data regarding the factors listed in that subsection and
9494 information indicating the effects of those factors on the Medicaid
9595 program that are unique to this state.
9696 (d) In addition to the modification to the FMAP described by
9797 Subsection (b) of this section, the commission shall make efforts
9898 to obtain additional federal Medicaid funding for Medicaid services
9999 required to be provided to illegal immigrants in this state. As
100100 part of that effort, the commission shall provide to the Texas
101101 delegation to the United States Congress and the federal Centers
102102 for Medicare and Medicaid Services and other appropriate federal
103103 agencies data regarding the costs to this state of providing those
104104 services.
105105 (e) This section expires September 1, 2013.
106106 SECTION 3. (a) The Medicaid Reform Waiver Legislative
107107 Oversight Committee is created to facilitate the reform waiver
108108 efforts with respect to Medicaid.
109109 (b) The committee is composed of eight members, as follows:
110110 (1) four members of the senate, appointed by the
111111 lieutenant governor not later than October 1, 2011; and
112112 (2) four members of the house of representatives,
113113 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives not later
114114 than October 1, 2011.
115115 (c) A member of the committee serves at the pleasure of the
116116 appointing official.
117117 (d) The lieutenant governor shall designate a member of the
118118 committee as the presiding officer.
119119 (e) A member of the committee may not receive compensation
120120 for serving on the committee but is entitled to reimbursement for
121121 travel expenses incurred by the member while conducting the
122122 business of the committee as provided by the General Appropriations
123123 Act.
124124 (f) The committee shall:
125125 (1) facilitate the design and development of the
126126 Medicaid reform waiver required by Chapter 536, Government Code, as
127127 added by this Act;
128128 (2) facilitate a smooth transition from existing
129129 Medicaid payment systems and benefit designs to a new model of
130130 Medicaid enabled by the waiver described by Subdivision (1) of this
131131 subsection;
132132 (3) meet at the call of the presiding officer; and
133133 (4) research, take public testimony, and issue reports
134134 requested by the lieutenant governor or speaker of the house of
135135 representatives.
136136 (g) The committee may request reports and other information
137137 from the Health and Human Services Commission.
138138 (h) The committee shall use existing staff of the senate,
139139 the house of representatives, and the Texas Legislative Council to
140140 assist the committee in performing its duties under this section.
141141 (i) Chapter 551, Government Code, applies to the committee.
142142 (j) The committee shall report to the lieutenant governor
143143 and speaker of the house of representatives not later than November
144144 15, 2012. The report must include:
145145 (1) identification of significant issues that impede
146146 the transition to a more effective Medicaid program;
147147 (2) the measures of effectiveness associated with
148148 changes to the Medicaid program;
149149 (3) the impact of Medicaid changes on safety net
150150 hospitals and other significant traditional providers; and
151151 (4) the impact on the uninsured in Texas.
152152 (k) This section expires September 1, 2013, and the
153153 committee is abolished on that date.
154154 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
155155 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
156156 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
157157 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
158158 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
159159 * * * * *