Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1344 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Burkett (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 1344
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 14, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 9, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain defenses to prosecution for the offense of
 sale, distribution, or display of harmful material to a minor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.24, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  It is an affirmative [a] defense to prosecution under
 this section that[:
 [(1)]  the sale, distribution, or exhibition was by a
 person having scientific, educational, governmental, or other
 similar justification[; or
 [(2)     the sale, distribution, or exhibition was to a
 minor who was accompanied by a consenting parent, guardian, or
 spouse].
 (c-1)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section that
 the actor was the spouse of the minor at the time of the offense.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense was
 committed before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *