Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2368
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#969
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 3575
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3575
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/11/11 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3555
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3555
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 565
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 565
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|