Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1355 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Orr, Smithee, Vo (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 1355
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2011;
 May 12, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to title insurance coverage for minerals and surface
 damage resulting from mineral extraction and development.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2703, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2703.0515 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2703.0515.  CERTAIN REQUIREMENTS PROHIBITED. (a) A
 title insurance company is not required to offer or provide in
 connection with a title insurance policy an endorsement insuring a
 loss from damage resulting from the use of the surface of the land
 for the extraction or development of coal, lignite, oil, gas, or
 another mineral if the policy includes a general exception or
 exclusion from coverage a loss from damage resulting from the use of
 the surface of the land for the extraction or development of coal,
 lignite, oil, gas, or another mineral.
 (b)  In this section, "general exception or exclusion" means
 a provision in a title insurance policy or other title insuring form
 that provides that title insurance coverage under the policy or
 form:
 (1)  is subject to, and the title insurer does not
 insure title to, and excepts from the description of the covered
 property, coal, lignite, oil, gas, and other minerals in and under
 and that may be produced from the covered property, together with
 related rights, privileges, and immunities; or
 (2)  does not cover a lease, grant, exception, or
 reservation of coal, lignite, oil, gas, or other minerals, or
 related rights, privileges, and immunities, appearing in the public
 records.
 (c)  An additional premium or other amount may not be charged
 for an endorsement to a loan policy of title insurance if the
 endorsement:
 (1)  insures against loss from damage to improvements
 or permanent buildings located on land that results from the future
 exercise of any right existing on the date of the loan policy to use
 the surface of the land for the extraction or development of coal,
 lignite, oil, gas, or another mineral;
 (2)  expressly does not insure against loss resulting
 from subsidence; and
 (3)  was promulgated by the commissioner in calendar
 year 2009.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2703, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 2703.055 and 2703.056 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 2703.055.  REQUIREMENT OF CERTAIN PROVISIONS
 PROHIBITED. The commissioner may not require by rule or through
 adoption of a title insurance policy or other insuring form that a
 title insurance policy delivered or issued for delivery in this
 state:
 (1)  insure against a loss that a person with an
 interest in real property sustains from damage to the property by
 reason of severance of minerals from the surface estate; or
 (2)  provide insurance as to ownership of minerals.
 Sec. 2703.056.  EXCEPTIONS; MINERAL INTERESTS. (a)  Subject
 to the underwriting standards of the title insurance company, a
 title insurance company may in a commitment for title insurance or a
 title insurance policy include a general exception or a special
 exception to except from coverage a mineral estate or an instrument
 which purports to reserve or transfer all or part of a mineral
 estate.
 (b)  The inclusion in a title insurance policy of a general
 exception or a special exception described by Subsection (a) does
 not create title insurance coverage as to the condition or
 ownership of the mineral estate.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 2703.055 and 2703.056, Insurance Code,
 as added by this Act, apply only to a title insurance policy that is
 delivered or issued for delivery on or after January 1, 2012. A
 policy delivered or issued for delivery before January 1, 2012, is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies only to a title insurance policy
 that is delivered or issued for delivery on or after January 1,
 2012. A policy delivered or issued for delivery before January 1,
 2012, is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *