E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5764
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4613
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#708
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/4/11 2:50 PM
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2778
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2778
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1545
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|