Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1395 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1395
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2011;
33 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
44 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 17, 2011, reported
55 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent
66 to printer.)
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to the requirements to operate personal watercraft and
1212 certain boats.
1313 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1414 SECTION 1. Section 31.106(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
1515 amended to read as follows:
1616 (a) No person shall operate a personal watercraft in the
1717 following manner or under the following circumstances:
1818 (1) unless each person riding on or towed behind the
1919 vessel is wearing a U.S. Coast Guard approved Type I, II, III, or V
2020 personal flotation device;
2121 (2) if the vessel is equipped by the manufacturer with
2222 a lanyard type engine cutoff switch, unless such lanyard is
2323 attached to the person, clothing, or personal flotation device of
2424 the operator as appropriate for the vessel involved;
2525 (3) during the period between sunset and sunrise;
2626 (4) within 50 feet of any other vessel, person,
2727 stationary platform or other object, or shore, except at headway
2828 speed;
2929 (5) if the operator is under 13 [16] years of age
3030 unless the operator is supervised by another person who:
3131 (A) is at least 18 years of age;
3232 (B) can lawfully operate the watercraft; and
3333 (C) is on board the watercraft when under way[,
3434 unless the operator:
3535 [(A) is accompanied by a person at least 18 years
3636 of age; or
3737 [(B) is at least 13 years of age and has
3838 successfully completed a boating safety course prescribed and
3939 approved by the department];
4040 (6) if the personal watercraft is a motorboat, within
4141 any area prohibited for operation of a motorboat by state law or
4242 local rule or regulation;
4343 (7) while towing water skis, an aquaplane, a
4444 surfboard, a tube, or any other similar device, unless the towing
4545 vessel is designed to carry on board a minimum of two persons;
4646 (8) by jumping the wake of another vessel recklessly
4747 or unnecessarily close to that vessel; or
4848 (9) in a manner that requires the operator to swerve at
4949 the last possible moment to avoid collision.
5050 SECTION 2. Section 31.107, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
5151 amended to read as follows:
5252 Sec. 31.107. OPERATION OF MOTORBOAT. No person may operate
5353 a motorboat powered by a motor with a manufacturer's rating of more
5454 than [over] 15 horsepower on the public waters of this state unless
5555 the person is [16 years of age or older or:
5656 [(1) is accompanied by a person (18) years of age or
5757 older; or
5858 [(2) is] at least 13 years of age or is supervised by
5959 another person who:
6060 (1) is at least 18 years of age;
6161 (2) can lawfully operate the motorboat; and
6262 (3) is on board the motorboat when under way [and has
6363 successfully passed a boating safety course prescribed and approved
6464 by the department].
6565 SECTION 3. Section 31.109, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
6666 amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), and (e) and adding
6767 Subsection (f) to read as follows:
6868 (a) This section applies only to a person who is:
6969 (1) born on or after September 1, 1993 [1984]; and
7070 (2) operating on the public water of this state:
7171 (A) a vessel powered by a motor with a
7272 manufacturer's rating of more than 15 [10] horsepower [or more]; or
7373 (B) a windblown vessel over 14 feet in length.
7474 (b) A person subject to this section must have in the
7575 person's possession[:
7676 [(1)] a photographic identification card[;] and
7777 either:
7878 (1) [(2)] a boater identification card issued by the
7979 department; or
8080 (2) proof of completion of the requirements to obtain
8181 a vessel operator's license issued by the United States Coast
8282 Guard.
8383 (e) If, on or before the trial of a person charged with an
8484 offense for failing to possess a document required under Subsection
8585 (b), the person produces for the court or the prosecuting attorney a
8686 document required by Subsection (b) that was issued to the person
8787 and was valid at the time of the offense, the court shall dismiss
8888 the charge [Upon proof of completion of a boater safety education
8989 course a court shall dismiss a violation of Subsections (b)(1) and
9090 (2)].
9191 (f) A person charged with a Class C Parks and Wildlife Code
9292 misdemeanor for failing to possess a document required under
9393 Subsection (b) may make to the court not later than the 10th day
9494 after the date of the alleged offense an oral or written motion
9595 requesting permission to take a boater education course approved by
9696 the department or a vessel operator's licensing course provided by
9797 the United States Coast Guard. The court shall defer the
9898 proceedings brought against a person who makes a motion described
9999 by this subsection and allow the person 90 days to present written
100100 evidence that the person has successfully completed the course
101101 approved by the department or provided by the United States Coast
102102 Guard. If the person successfully completes the course and the
103103 court accepts the presented evidence, the court shall dismiss the
104104 charge.
105105 SECTION 4. Section 31.110, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
106106 amended to read as follows:
107107 Sec. 31.110. EXEMPTION FROM BOATER EDUCATION COURSE
108108 REQUIREMENT; DEFERRAL PROGRAM. (a) A person is not required to
109109 comply with Section 31.109 if the person:
110110 (1) holds a master's, mate's, or operator's license
111111 issued by the United States Coast Guard;
112112 (2) is supervised by a person who is at least 18 years
113113 of age and who[:
114114 [(A)] is otherwise exempt from the requirements
115115 of Section 31.109 or possesses a boater identification card as
116116 required by Section 31.109; [and
117117 [(B) is at least 18 years of age;]
118118 (3) [is at least 18 years of age;
119119 [(4)] is not a resident of this state and has proof
120120 that the person has successfully completed a boater education
121121 course or equivalency examination in another state that is approved
122122 by the department;
123123 (4) is exempt by rule of the commission as a customer
124124 of a business engaged in renting, showing, demonstrating, or
125125 testing boats; or
126126 (5) is exempt by rule of the commission [department].
127127 (b) For purposes of this section, to be considered to be
128128 supervising the operator of a watercraft, the person must be on
129129 board the watercraft when under way.
130130 (c) The commission by rule shall establish a boater
131131 education deferral program. The deferral program must be available
132132 at no cost to boat dealers, manufacturers, and distributors.
133133 SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
134134 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
135135 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is covered
136136 by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the former
137137 law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this
138138 section, an offense was committed before the effective date of this
139139 Act if any element of the offense was committed before that date.
140140 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
141141 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
142142 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
143143 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
144144 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
145145 * * * * *