Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1401 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Laubenberg (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1401
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 10, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to who may participate in certain local option elections
 to prohibit or authorize the sale of alcoholic beverages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 501, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 501.1035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.1035.  ELECTION IN TERRITORY ANNEXED BY
 MUNICIPALITY. A municipality that includes an area annexed to the
 municipality on or after the date on which a petition requesting a
 local option election in the municipality is filed may hold the
 election in the municipality only if the petition contains a
 sufficient number of signatures to meet the requirements of Section
 501.032, based on the number of qualified voters in the
 municipality, including the annexed area.  The qualified voters of
 the annexed area must be allowed to vote in the local option
 election. The results of the election shall determine the local
 option status of the municipality, including the annexed area.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *