Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1402 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1402
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of the law on the consequences of a
 criminal conviction to law enforcement officer license holders and
 applicants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 53.002, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 53.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter does
 not apply to:
 (1)  the Supreme Court of Texas, a person licensed
 under the court's authority on behalf of the judicial department of
 government, or an applicant for a license issued under the court's
 authority on behalf of the judicial department of government;
 (2)  a person licensed [peace officer] or an applicant
 for a license under Chapter 1701 [as a peace officer described by
 Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure];
 (3)  an applicant for certification as emergency
 medical services personnel under Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code; or
 (4)  a person who:
 (A)  is licensed by the Texas Medical Board, the
 Texas State Board of Pharmacy, the State Board of Dental Examiners,
 or the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners; and
 (B)  has been convicted of a felony under Chapter
 481 or 483 or Section 485.033, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *