House | 05/05/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 590 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 590 | |
House | 02/17/2011 | Filed |