House
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB727
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1564
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 591
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 591
|
House
|
02/17/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|