E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5764
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Redistricting, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#596
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
3-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amended
|
5-Allen
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
38-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
35-Turner, Y. Davis, Giddings, McClendon, Reynolds, Dutton, Thompson, and Mallory Caraway
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
36-Turner
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
35-Turner, Y. Davis, Giddings, McClendon, Reynolds, Dutton, Thompson, and Mallory Caraway
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
28-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
27-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
26-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Amended
|
25-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
23-Woolley
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#578
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
21-Perry
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
19-V. Gonzales, Martinez, and Muoz
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
16-T. King
|
Journal Page: 2305
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 20
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#460
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Redistricting
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|