Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1514 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Isaac, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1514
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 2, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 12, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 12, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance to veterans of specially marked driver's
 licenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.1235 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.1235.  DESIGNATOR ON LICENSE ISSUED TO VETERAN.
 (a) In this section, "veteran" means a person who:
 (1)  has served in:
 (A)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or
 marine corps of the United States; or
 (B)  the Texas National Guard as defined by
 Section 431.001, Government Code; and
 (2)  has been honorably discharged from the branch of
 the service in which the person served.
 (b)  The department shall include the designation "VETERAN"
 on a driver's license issued to a veteran in an available space
 either on the face of the driver's license or on the reverse side of
 the driver's license if:
 (1)  the veteran requests the designation; and
 (2)  the veteran provides proof of the veteran's
 military service and honorable discharge.
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.142, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  The application must provide space for the applicant:
 (1)  to voluntarily list any military service that may
 qualify the applicant to receive a license with a veteran's
 designation under Section 521.1235; and
 (2)  to include proof required by the department to
 determine the applicant's eligibility to receive that designation.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *