Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1529 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miller of Erath, Harper-Brown H.B. No. 1529
 (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 April 28, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the offense of fraudulent use or possession of
 identifying information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 32.51(a)(1), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Identifying information" means information that
 alone or in conjunction with other information identifies a person,
 including a person's:
 (A)  name and [social security number,] date of
 birth[, or government-issued identification number];
 (B)  unique biometric data, including the
 person's fingerprint, voice print, or retina or iris image;
 (C)  unique electronic identification number,
 address, routing code, or financial institution account number;
 [and]
 (D)  telecommunication identifying information or
 access device; and
 (E)  social security number or other
 government-issued identification number.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *