Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1545 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lewis (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1545
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 April 28, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to
 change the date of their general elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 41.0052(a) and (a-1), Election Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  [The governing body of a political subdivision other
 than a county may, not later than December 31, 2005, change the date
 on which it holds its general election for officers to another
 authorized uniform election date.
 [(a-1)]  The governing body of a political subdivision,
 other than a county, that holds its general election for officers on
 a date other than the November uniform election date may, not later
 than December 31, 2012 [2010], change the date on which it holds its
 general election for officers to the November uniform election
 date.
 SECTION 2.  Section 41.0053, Election Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *