1 | 1 | | By: Brown (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 1625 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Business and Commerce; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the renewal of electrical sign apprentice licenses. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 1305.168(b-1), Occupations Code, is |
---|
13 | 13 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (b-1) To renew an electrical apprentice license or |
---|
15 | 15 | | electrical sign apprentice license, a license holder who is not |
---|
16 | 16 | | enrolled in an apprenticeship training program must complete four |
---|
17 | 17 | | hours of continuing education annually. Continuing education |
---|
18 | 18 | | courses that satisfy the requirements of this subsection must |
---|
19 | 19 | | address safety, the National Electrical Code, as adopted under |
---|
20 | 20 | | Section 1305.101, and state laws and rules that regulate the |
---|
21 | 21 | | conduct of license holders under this chapter. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to the |
---|
23 | 23 | | renewal of an electrical sign apprentice license that expires on or |
---|
24 | 24 | | after September 1, 2012. A license that expires before September 1, |
---|
25 | 25 | | 2012, is governed by the law in effect on the date the license was |
---|
26 | 26 | | issued, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
28 | 28 | | * * * * * |
---|