Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1625 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Brown (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 1625
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the renewal of electrical sign apprentice licenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1305.168(b-1), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b-1)  To renew an electrical apprentice license or
 electrical sign apprentice license, a license holder who is not
 enrolled in an apprenticeship training program must complete four
 hours of continuing education annually.  Continuing education
 courses that satisfy the requirements of this subsection must
 address safety, the National Electrical Code, as adopted under
 Section 1305.101, and state laws and rules that regulate the
 conduct of license holders under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 renewal of an electrical sign apprentice license that expires on or
 after September 1, 2012. A license that expires before September 1,
 2012, is governed by the law in effect on the date the license was
 issued, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *