1 | 1 | | 82R23186 AJZ-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Harper-Brown H.B. No. 1669 |
---|
3 | 3 | | Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1669: |
---|
4 | 4 | | By: Bonnen C.S.H.B. No. 1669 |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the establishment of a motor vehicle mileage fee pilot |
---|
10 | 10 | | program for certain motor vehicles by the Texas Department of Motor |
---|
11 | 11 | | Vehicles. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) "Department" means the Texas Department of Motor |
---|
15 | 15 | | Vehicles. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) "Electric motor vehicle" means a motor vehicle |
---|
17 | 17 | | that uses electricity as its only source of motor power. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) "Hybrid motor vehicle" means a motor vehicle that |
---|
19 | 19 | | draws propulsion energy from both gasoline or conventional diesel |
---|
20 | 20 | | fuel and a rechargeable energy storage system. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (4) "Liquefied fuel motor vehicle" means a motor |
---|
22 | 22 | | vehicle that operates on one or any combination of the following: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (A) liquefied natural gas; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (B) butane; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (C) ethane; or |
---|
26 | 26 | | (D) propane. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (5) "Plug-in hybrid electric motor vehicle" means a |
---|
28 | 28 | | motor vehicle that draws propulsion energy from both gasoline or |
---|
29 | 29 | | conventional diesel fuel and batteries that can be charged from an |
---|
30 | 30 | | external electrical outlet. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. MOTOR VEHICLE MILEAGE FEE PILOT PROGRAM. (a) |
---|
32 | 32 | | The department, in consultation with the Texas Department of |
---|
33 | 33 | | Transportation, Department of Public Safety, and comptroller of |
---|
34 | 34 | | public accounts, by rule shall: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) establish the administrative framework needed to |
---|
36 | 36 | | implement a system for assessing a motor vehicle mileage fee; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) implement a pilot program to gather data regarding |
---|
38 | 38 | | the feasibility of implementing a motor vehicle mileage fee using |
---|
39 | 39 | | the established mileage fee framework. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (b) A person who owns an electric motor vehicle, a plug-in |
---|
41 | 41 | | hybrid electric motor vehicle, a hybrid motor vehicle, or a |
---|
42 | 42 | | liquefied fuel motor vehicle that is registered in Dallas or |
---|
43 | 43 | | Tarrant County is eligible to participate in the pilot program. The |
---|
44 | 44 | | pilot program must provide for optional participation and be |
---|
45 | 45 | | available to the first 1,000 persons eligible to participate. A |
---|
46 | 46 | | person participating in the pilot program may not be charged a fee |
---|
47 | 47 | | for participating in the pilot program. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (c) The department must establish the administrative |
---|
49 | 49 | | framework needed to implement a system for assessing a motor |
---|
50 | 50 | | vehicle mileage fee not later than January 1, 2012. The pilot |
---|
51 | 51 | | program must begin not later than January 1, 2012, and must end not |
---|
52 | 52 | | later than July 15, 2012. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (d) The department, in consultation with the Texas |
---|
54 | 54 | | Department of Transportation, Department of Public Safety, and |
---|
55 | 55 | | comptroller of public accounts, shall establish incentives for |
---|
56 | 56 | | participation in the pilot program. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (e) A person who participates in the pilot program must have |
---|
58 | 58 | | the mileage of the person's vehicle determined by an odometer |
---|
59 | 59 | | reading that will occur in a manner specified by the department. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (f) In evaluating the feasibility of implementing a motor |
---|
61 | 61 | | vehicle mileage fee, the department shall consider, to the extent |
---|
62 | 62 | | possible: |
---|
63 | 63 | | (1) economic efficiency; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (2) long-term revenue generation; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (3) long-term revenue stability; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (4) charging fairness; and |
---|
67 | 67 | | (5) privacy concerns. |
---|
68 | 68 | | SECTION 3. REPORT. Not later than October 1, 2014, the |
---|
69 | 69 | | department shall submit a report to the legislature that includes |
---|
70 | 70 | | recommendations regarding the feasibility of assessing a motor |
---|
71 | 71 | | vehicle mileage fee in this state or another fee to replace the gas |
---|
72 | 72 | | tax. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 4. EXPIRATION. This Act expires December 31, 2014. |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
75 | 75 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
76 | 76 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
77 | 77 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
78 | 78 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|