Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1669 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R23186 AJZ-D
 By: Harper-Brown H.B. No. 1669
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1669:
 By:  Bonnen C.S.H.B. No. 1669


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a motor vehicle mileage fee pilot
 program for certain motor vehicles by the Texas Department of Motor
 Vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS.  In this Act:
 (1)  "Department" means the Texas Department of Motor
 Vehicles.
 (2)  "Electric motor vehicle" means a motor vehicle
 that uses electricity as its only source of motor power.
 (3)  "Hybrid motor vehicle" means a motor vehicle that
 draws propulsion energy from both gasoline or conventional diesel
 fuel and a rechargeable energy storage system.
 (4)  "Liquefied fuel motor vehicle" means a motor
 vehicle that operates on one or any combination of the following:
 (A)  liquefied natural gas;
 (B)  butane;
 (C)  ethane; or
 (D)  propane.
 (5)  "Plug-in hybrid electric motor vehicle" means a
 motor vehicle that draws propulsion energy from both gasoline or
 conventional diesel fuel and batteries that can be charged from an
 external electrical outlet.
 SECTION 2.  MOTOR VEHICLE MILEAGE FEE PILOT PROGRAM. (a)
 The department, in consultation with the Texas Department of
 Transportation, Department of Public Safety, and comptroller of
 public accounts, by rule shall:
 (1)  establish the administrative framework needed to
 implement a system for assessing a motor vehicle mileage fee; and
 (2)  implement a pilot program to gather data regarding
 the feasibility of implementing a motor vehicle mileage fee using
 the established mileage fee framework.
 (b)  A person who owns an electric motor vehicle, a plug-in
 hybrid electric motor vehicle, a hybrid motor vehicle, or a
 liquefied fuel motor vehicle that is registered in Dallas or
 Tarrant County is eligible to participate in the pilot program. The
 pilot program must provide for optional participation and be
 available to the first 1,000 persons eligible to participate. A
 person participating in the pilot program may not be charged a fee
 for participating in the pilot program.
 (c)  The department must establish the administrative
 framework needed to implement a system for assessing a motor
 vehicle mileage fee not later than January 1, 2012. The pilot
 program must begin not later than January 1, 2012, and must end not
 later than July 15, 2012.
 (d)  The department, in consultation with the Texas
 Department of Transportation, Department of Public Safety, and
 comptroller of public accounts, shall establish incentives for
 participation in the pilot program.
 (e)  A person who participates in the pilot program must have
 the mileage of the person's vehicle determined by an odometer
 reading that will occur in a manner specified by the department.
 (f)  In evaluating the feasibility of implementing a motor
 vehicle mileage fee, the department shall consider, to the extent
 possible:
 (1)  economic efficiency;
 (2)  long-term revenue generation;
 (3)  long-term revenue stability;
 (4)  charging fairness; and
 (5)  privacy concerns.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than October 1, 2014, the
 department shall submit a report to the legislature that includes
 recommendations regarding the feasibility of assessing a motor
 vehicle mileage fee in this state or another fee to replace the gas
 tax.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires December 31, 2014.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011.