Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2182
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2182
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 667
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 667
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|