House | 05/03/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2744 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 894 | Journal Page: 2743 |
House | 05/02/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1503 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Filed |