Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1771 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Madden (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 1771
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Specialty Courts Advisory
 Council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 772, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 772.0061 to read as follows:
 Sec. 772.0061.  SPECIALTY COURTS ADVISORY COUNCIL. (a) In
 this section:
 (1)  "Council" means the Specialty Courts Advisory
 Council.
 (2)  "Specialty court" means:
 (A)  a drug court program established under
 Chapter 469, Health and Safety Code;
 (B)  a mental health court program established
 under Chapter 616, Health and Safety Code; and
 (C)  a veterans court program established under
 Chapter 617, Health and Safety Code.
 (b)  The governor shall establish the Specialty Courts
 Advisory Council within the criminal justice division established
 under Section 772.006 to evaluate applications for grant funding
 for specialty courts in this state and to make funding
 recommendations to the criminal justice division.
 (c)  The council is composed of seven members appointed by
 the governor as follows:
 (1)  three members with experience as judges of a
 specialty court; and
 (2)  four members who represent the public.
 (d)  The members appointed under Subsection (c)(2) must:
 (1)  reside in various geographic regions of the state;
 and
 (2)  have experience practicing law in a specialty
 court or possess knowledge and expertise in a field relating to
 behavioral or mental health issues or to substance abuse treatment.
 (e)  Members are appointed for staggered six-year terms. The
 terms of either two or three members, as applicable, expire
 February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 (f)  A person may not be a member of the council if the person
 is required to register as a lobbyist under Chapter 305 because of
 the person's activities for compensation on behalf of a profession
 related to the operation of the council.
 (g)  If a vacancy occurs on the council, the governor shall
 appoint a person to serve for the remainder of the unexpired term.
 (h)  The council shall select a presiding officer.
 (i)  The council shall meet at the call of its presiding
 officer or at the request of the governor.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than February 1, 2012, the governor
 shall appoint the members of the Specialty Courts Advisory Council
 created by Section 772.0061, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 The governor shall appoint two members to terms expiring February
 1, 2013, two members to terms expiring February 1, 2015, and three
 members to terms expiring February 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *