E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6918 | |
E | 05/23/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5399 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2969 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4761 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5048 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4220 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2143 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2143 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2053 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#742 | Journal Page: 2964 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2964 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2964 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2884 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Amended | 1-L. Taylor | Journal Page: 2882 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2882 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 673 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 673 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Filed |