Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1789 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 1789
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 9, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 9, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of state funds directly to an entity that
 conducts a primary election under contract in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 173, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 173.0832 to read as follows:
 Sec. 173.0832.  DIRECT REPAYMENT TO AUTHORITY CONDUCTING
 PRIMARY ELECTION UNDER CONTRACT IN CERTAIN COUNTIES. On request of
 a county election officer of a county with a population of 100,000
 or more who conducts a primary election under an election services
 contract authorized under Subchapter D, Chapter 31, the secretary
 of state may provide payment of primary expenses directly to the
 officer who incurs the expense rather than to the county chair under
 this subchapter. The secretary of state shall prescribe procedures
 to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *