|
05/25/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3804
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/12/11 10:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|