Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1937 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Simpson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 1937
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 16, 2011;
 May 17, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 21, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prosecution and punishment for the offense of official
 oppression by the intrusive touching of persons seeking access to
 public buildings and transportation; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.03, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (c-1) and
 (c-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who is a public servant [acting under color of
 his office or employment] commits an offense if the person:
 (1)  while acting under color of the person's office or
 employment [he]:
 (A) [(1)]  intentionally subjects another person
 to mistreatment or to arrest, detention, search, seizure,
 dispossession, assessment, or lien that the actor [he] knows is
 unlawful;
 (B) [(2)]  intentionally denies or impedes
 another person in the exercise or enjoyment of any right,
 privilege, power, or immunity, knowing the actor's [his] conduct is
 unlawful; or
 (C) [(3)]  intentionally subjects another person
 to sexual harassment; or
 (2)  while acting under color of the person's office or
 employment without probable cause to believe the other person
 committed an offense:
 (A)  performs a search for the purpose of granting
 access to a publicly accessible building or form of transportation;
 and
 (B)  intentionally, knowingly, or recklessly:
 (i)  touches the anus, sexual organ,
 buttocks, or breast of the other person, including touching through
 clothing; or
 (ii)  touches the other person in a manner
 that would be offensive to a reasonable person.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, a person who is a public
 servant acts under color of the person's [his] office or employment
 if the person [he] acts or purports to act in an official capacity
 or takes advantage of such actual or purported capacity.
 (c-1)  For purposes of Subsection (a)(2), "public servant"
 includes:
 (1)  an officer, employee, or agent of:
 (A)  the United States;
 (B)  a branch, department, or agency of the United
 States; or
 (C)  another person acting under contract with a
 branch, department, or agency of the United States for the purpose
 of providing a security or law enforcement service; and
 (2)  any other person acting under color of federal
 law.
 (c-2)  For a person described by Subsection (c-1)(1) or (2),
 it is a defense to prosecution for an offense under Subsection
 (a)(2) that the actor performed the search pursuant to and
 consistent with an explicit and applicable grant of federal
 statutory authority that is consistent with the United States
 Constitution.
 SECTION 2.  (a) This section applies only to a prosecution of
 an offense under Section 39.03(a)(2), Penal Code, as added by this
 Act, in which the defendant was, at the time of the alleged offense,
 acting under the color of federal law.
 (b)  In a prosecution described by Subsection (a) of this
 section, if the government of the United States, the defendant, or
 the defendant's employer challenges the validity of Section
 39.03(a)(2), Penal Code, as added by this Act, on grounds of
 unconstitutionality, preemption, or sovereign immunity, the
 attorney general of this state, with the consent of the appropriate
 local county or district attorney, shall take any actions necessary
 on behalf of the state to defend the validity of the statute. The
 attorney general may make any legal arguments the attorney general
 considers appropriate, including that this Act constitutes a valid
 exercise of:
 (1)  the state's police powers;
 (2)  the liberty interests of the people secured by the
 Ninth Amendment to the United States Constitution;
 (3)  the powers reserved to the states by the Tenth
 Amendment to the United States Constitution; or
 (4)  the rights and protections secured by the Texas
 Constitution.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *