House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|