1 | 1 | | By: Kolkhorst, Walle, et al. H.B. No. 1983 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) |
---|
3 | 3 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
5 | 5 | | and Human Services; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
6 | 6 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to certain childbirths occurring before the 39th week of |
---|
12 | 12 | | gestation. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, |
---|
15 | 15 | | is amended by adding Section 32.0313 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 32.0313. INDUCED DELIVERIES OR CESAREAN SECTIONS |
---|
17 | 17 | | BEFORE 39TH WEEK. (a) The department shall achieve cost savings |
---|
18 | 18 | | with improved outcomes by adopting and implementing quality |
---|
19 | 19 | | initiatives that are evidence-based, tested, and fully consistent |
---|
20 | 20 | | with established standards of clinical care and that are designed |
---|
21 | 21 | | to reduce the number of elective or nonmedically indicated induced |
---|
22 | 22 | | deliveries or cesarean sections performed at a hospital on a |
---|
23 | 23 | | medical assistance recipient before the 39th week of gestation. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (b) The department shall coordinate with physicians, |
---|
25 | 25 | | hospitals, managed care organizations, and the department's |
---|
26 | 26 | | billing contractor for the medical assistance program to develop a |
---|
27 | 27 | | process for collecting information regarding the number of induced |
---|
28 | 28 | | deliveries and cesarean sections described by Subsection (a) that |
---|
29 | 29 | | occur during prescribed periods. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 241, Health and Safety |
---|
31 | 31 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 241.007 to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 32 | | Sec. 241.007. INDUCED DELIVERIES OR CESAREAN SECTIONS |
---|
33 | 33 | | BEFORE 39TH WEEK. A hospital that provides obstetrical services |
---|
34 | 34 | | shall collaborate with physicians providing services at the |
---|
35 | 35 | | hospital to develop quality initiatives to reduce the number of |
---|
36 | 36 | | elective or nonmedically indicated induced deliveries or cesarean |
---|
37 | 37 | | sections performed at the hospital on a woman before the 39th week |
---|
38 | 38 | | of gestation. |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 3. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission |
---|
40 | 40 | | shall conduct a study to assess the effects of the quality |
---|
41 | 41 | | initiatives adopted under Section 32.0313, Human Resources Code, as |
---|
42 | 42 | | added by this Act, and Section 241.007, Health and Safety Code, as |
---|
43 | 43 | | added by this Act, on infant health and frequency of infant |
---|
44 | 44 | | admissions to neonatal intensive care units and hospital |
---|
45 | 45 | | readmissions for mothers and infants. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2012, the Health and Human |
---|
47 | 47 | | Services Commission shall submit a written report containing the |
---|
48 | 48 | | findings of the study conducted under this section together with |
---|
49 | 49 | | the commission's recommendations to the standing committees of the |
---|
50 | 50 | | senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction |
---|
51 | 51 | | over public health. |
---|
52 | 52 | | SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
53 | 53 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
54 | 54 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
55 | 55 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
56 | 56 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
57 | 57 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
58 | 58 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
59 | 59 | | * * * * * |
---|