Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1983 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst, Walle, et al. H.B. No. 1983
 (Senate Sponsor - Nelson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain childbirths occurring before the 39th week of
 gestation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0313 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0313.  INDUCED DELIVERIES OR CESAREAN SECTIONS
 BEFORE 39TH WEEK. (a)  The department shall achieve cost savings
 with improved outcomes by adopting and implementing quality
 initiatives that are evidence-based, tested, and fully consistent
 with established standards of clinical care and that are designed
 to reduce the number of elective or nonmedically indicated induced
 deliveries or cesarean sections performed at a hospital on a
 medical assistance recipient before the 39th week of gestation.
 (b)  The department shall coordinate with physicians,
 hospitals, managed care organizations, and the department's
 billing contractor for the medical assistance program to develop a
 process for collecting information regarding the number of induced
 deliveries and cesarean sections described by Subsection (a) that
 occur during prescribed periods.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.007.  INDUCED DELIVERIES OR CESAREAN SECTIONS
 BEFORE 39TH WEEK. A hospital that provides obstetrical services
 shall collaborate with physicians providing services at the
 hospital to develop quality initiatives to reduce the number of
 elective or nonmedically indicated induced deliveries or cesarean
 sections performed at the hospital on a woman before the 39th week
 of gestation.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall conduct a study to assess the effects of the quality
 initiatives adopted under Section 32.0313, Human Resources Code, as
 added by this Act, and Section 241.007, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, on infant health and frequency of infant
 admissions to neonatal intensive care units and hospital
 readmissions for mothers and infants.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2012, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall submit a written report containing the
 findings of the study conducted under this section together with
 the commission's recommendations to the standing committees of the
 senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction
 over public health.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *