Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2047 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lewis (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 2047
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to service of process at the registered office of certain
 registered agents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.201, Business Organizations Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A registered agent that is an organization must have an
 employee available at the registered office during normal business
 hours to receive service of process, notice, or demand. Any
 employee of the organization may receive service at the registered
 office.
 SECTION 2.  Section 5.201(d), Business Organizations Code,
 as added by this Act, applies to all process served on or after the
 effective date of this Act, without regard to whether the process
 was issued before, on, or after that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *