E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6918 | |
E | 05/23/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5399 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2969 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4761 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5048 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4221 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2054 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#722 | Journal Page: 2943 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2943 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2943 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2925 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2925 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 711 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 711 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Filed |