E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6874
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4060
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2184
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2184
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|