Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2080 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Zavala (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 2080
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 2, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 19, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 19, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certification of a person as eligible for disabled
 parking privileges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 681.003(f), Transportation Code, as
 added by Chapter 842 (S.B. 1984), Acts of the 81st Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as follows:
 (f)  This subsection applies only to the first application
 for a disabled parking placard submitted by a person [who resides in
 a county with a population of 125,000 or less].  The notarized
 written statement or prescription may be issued by:
 (1)  a person acting under the delegation and
 supervision of a licensed physician in conformance with Subchapter
 B, Chapter 157, Occupations Code; or
 (2)  a physician assistant licensed to practice in this
 state acting as the agent of a licensed physician under Section
 204.202(e), Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *