Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2141 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 2141
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 4, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 19, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to enforcement of laws related to water safety.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.121, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Game wardens commissioned by the commission are the
 primary enforcement officers responsible for enforcing the
 provisions of this chapter related to water safety.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *