Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2189 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Elkins (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 2189
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 17, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of handfishing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 66, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 66.115 to read as follows:
 Sec. 66.115.  HANDFISHING. (a)  In this section,
 "handfishing" means fishing for catfish by the use of hands only and
 without any other fishing device such as a gaff, pole hook, trap, or
 spear.
 (b)  A person holding the required fishing license and
 freshwater fishing stamp issued to the person by the department may
 engage in handfishing in the public fresh water of this state.
 (c)  The commission may adopt rules related to handfishing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *