Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2273 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3690 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1005 | Journal Page: 3689 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3689 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3689 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3601 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3601 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3600 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3599 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 3:15 PM | Journal Page: 3575 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 3402 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3402 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Postponed | 5/10/11 3:00 PM | Journal Page: 3230 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3230 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 5/9/11 3:00 PM | Journal Page: 2892 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2892 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 03/04/2011 | Filed |