Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2238 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Creighton (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2238
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the Montgomery County
 Municipal Utility District No. 112.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 6, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Chapter 8370 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 8370.  MONTGOMERY COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 112
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 8370.001.  DEFINITION.  In this chapter, "district"
 means the Montgomery County Municipal Utility District No. 112.
 [Sections 8370.002-8370.100 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER B.  POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 8370.101.  MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT POWERS AND
 DUTIES.  The district has the powers and duties provided by the
 general law of this state, including Chapters 49 and 54, Water Code,
 applicable to municipal utility districts created under Section 59,
 Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 Sec. 8370.102.  NO ALLOCATION AGREEMENT. Section 54.016(f),
 Water Code, does not apply to the district.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *