1 | 1 | | By: Zerwas, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 2245 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to physician incentive programs to reduce hospital |
---|
11 | 11 | | emergency room use for non-emergent conditions by Medicaid |
---|
12 | 12 | | recipients. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Sections 531.086 and 531.0861 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 531.086. STUDY REGARDING PHYSICIAN INCENTIVE PROGRAMS |
---|
17 | 17 | | TO REDUCE HOSPITAL EMERGENCY ROOM USE FOR NON-EMERGENT CONDITIONS. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (a) The commission shall conduct a study to evaluate physician |
---|
19 | 19 | | incentive programs that attempt to reduce hospital emergency room |
---|
20 | 20 | | use for non-emergent conditions by recipients under the medical |
---|
21 | 21 | | assistance program. Each physician incentive program evaluated in |
---|
22 | 22 | | the study must: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) be administered by a health maintenance |
---|
24 | 24 | | organization participating in the STAR or STAR + PLUS Medicaid |
---|
25 | 25 | | managed care program; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) provide incentives to primary care providers who |
---|
27 | 27 | | attempt to reduce emergency room use for non-emergent conditions by |
---|
28 | 28 | | recipients. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (b) The study conducted under Subsection (a) must evaluate: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) the cost-effectiveness of each component included |
---|
31 | 31 | | in a physician incentive program; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) any change in statute required to implement each |
---|
33 | 33 | | component within the Medicaid fee-for-service or primary care case |
---|
34 | 34 | | management model. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (c) Not later than August 31, 2012, the executive |
---|
36 | 36 | | commissioner shall submit to the governor and the Legislative |
---|
37 | 37 | | Budget Board a report summarizing the findings of the study |
---|
38 | 38 | | required by this section. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (d) This section expires September 1, 2013. |
---|
40 | 40 | | Sec. 531.0861. PHYSICIAN INCENTIVE PROGRAM TO REDUCE |
---|
41 | 41 | | HOSPITAL EMERGENCY ROOM USE FOR NON-EMERGENT CONDITIONS. (a) The |
---|
42 | 42 | | executive commissioner by rule shall establish a physician |
---|
43 | 43 | | incentive program designed to reduce the use of hospital emergency |
---|
44 | 44 | | room services for non-emergent conditions by recipients under the |
---|
45 | 45 | | medical assistance program. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (b) In establishing the physician incentive program under |
---|
47 | 47 | | Subsection (a), the executive commissioner may include only the |
---|
48 | 48 | | program components identified as cost-effective in the study |
---|
49 | 49 | | conducted under Section 531.086. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (c) If the physician incentive program includes the payment |
---|
51 | 51 | | of an enhanced reimbursement rate for routine after-hours |
---|
52 | 52 | | appointments, the executive commissioner shall implement controls |
---|
53 | 53 | | to ensure that the after-hours services billed are actually being |
---|
54 | 54 | | provided outside of normal business hours. |
---|
55 | 55 | | SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
56 | 56 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
57 | 57 | | federal agency is necessary for the implementation of that |
---|
58 | 58 | | provision, the agency affected by the provision shall request the |
---|
59 | 59 | | waiver or authorization and may delay implementing that provision |
---|
60 | 60 | | until the waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
61 | 61 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
62 | 62 | | * * * * * |
---|