Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2245 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zerwas, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 2245
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to physician incentive programs to reduce hospital
 emergency room use for non-emergent conditions by Medicaid
 recipients.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 531.086 and 531.0861 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.086.  STUDY REGARDING PHYSICIAN INCENTIVE PROGRAMS
 TO REDUCE HOSPITAL EMERGENCY ROOM USE FOR NON-EMERGENT CONDITIONS.
 (a)  The commission shall conduct a study to evaluate physician
 incentive programs that attempt to reduce hospital emergency room
 use for non-emergent conditions by recipients under the medical
 assistance program. Each physician incentive program evaluated in
 the study must:
 (1)  be administered by a health maintenance
 organization participating in the STAR or STAR + PLUS Medicaid
 managed care program; and
 (2)  provide incentives to primary care providers who
 attempt to reduce emergency room use for non-emergent conditions by
 recipients.
 (b)  The study conducted under Subsection (a) must evaluate:
 (1)  the cost-effectiveness of each component included
 in a physician incentive program; and
 (2)  any change in statute required to implement each
 component within the Medicaid fee-for-service or primary care case
 management model.
 (c)  Not later than August 31, 2012, the executive
 commissioner shall submit to the governor and the Legislative
 Budget Board a report summarizing the findings of the study
 required by this section.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2013.
 Sec. 531.0861.  PHYSICIAN INCENTIVE PROGRAM TO REDUCE
 HOSPITAL EMERGENCY ROOM USE FOR NON-EMERGENT CONDITIONS.  (a)  The
 executive commissioner by rule shall establish a physician
 incentive program designed to reduce the use of hospital emergency
 room services for non-emergent conditions by recipients under the
 medical assistance program.
 (b)  In establishing the physician incentive program under
 Subsection (a), the executive commissioner may include only the
 program components identified as cost-effective in the study
 conducted under Section 531.086.
 (c)  If the physician incentive program includes the payment
 of an enhanced reimbursement rate for routine after-hours
 appointments, the executive commissioner shall implement controls
 to ensure that the after-hours services billed are actually being
 provided outside of normal business hours.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for the implementation of that
 provision, the agency affected by the provision shall request the
 waiver or authorization and may delay implementing that provision
 until the waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *