E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#406
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#401
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/15/11 1:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|