Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2251 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Bonnen (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2251
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2011;
33 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
44 Government Organization; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the
55 following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Public
1111 Finance Authority.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Section 1232.072, Government Code, is amended to
1414 read as follows:
1515 Sec. 1232.072. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Public Finance
1616 Authority is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
1717 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the authority
1818 is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023 [2011].
1919 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 1232, Government Code, is
2020 amended by adding Section 1232.073 to read as follows:
2121 Sec. 1232.073. NEGOTIATED RULEMAKING AND ALTERNATIVE
2222 DISPUTE RESOLUTION. (a) The board shall develop and implement a
2323 policy to encourage the use of:
2424 (1) negotiated rulemaking procedures under Chapter
2525 2008 for the adoption of authority rules; and
2626 (2) appropriate alternative dispute resolution
2727 procedures under Chapter 2009 to assist in the resolution of
2828 internal and external disputes under the authority's jurisdiction.
2929 (b) The authority's procedures relating to alternative
3030 dispute resolution must conform, to the extent possible, to any
3131 model guidelines issued by the State Office of Administrative
3232 Hearings for the use of alternative dispute resolution by state
3333 agencies.
3434 (c) The authority shall:
3535 (1) coordinate the implementation of the policy
3636 adopted under Subsection (a);
3737 (2) provide training as needed to implement the
3838 procedures for negotiated rulemaking or alternative dispute
3939 resolution; and
4040 (3) collect data concerning the effectiveness of those
4141 procedures.
4242 SECTION 3. Section 1232.101, Government Code, is amended to
4343 read as follows:
4444 Sec. 1232.101. ISSUANCE OF BONDS FOR CERTAIN STATE
4545 AGENCIES. (a) With respect to all bonds authorized to be issued by
4646 or on behalf of the adjutant general's department, Parks and
4747 Wildlife Department, Texas Agricultural Finance Authority, Texas
4848 Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Authority[, Stephen F. Austin
4949 State University], Midwestern State University, and Texas Southern
5050 University, the authority has the exclusive authority to act on
5151 behalf of those entities in issuing bonds on their behalf. In
5252 connection with those issuances and with the issuance of refunding
5353 bonds on behalf of those entities, the authority is subject to all
5454 rights, duties, and conditions surrounding issuance previously
5555 applicable to the issuing entity under the statute authorizing the
5656 issuance. A reference in an authorizing statute to the entity on
5757 whose behalf the bonds are being issued applies equally to the
5858 authority in its capacity as issuer on behalf of the entity.
5959 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (a), the authority may,
6060 under an agreement entered into with Texas State Technical College
6161 System or a general academic teaching institution as defined by
6262 Section 61.003, Education Code, act on behalf of Texas State
6363 Technical College System or a general academic teaching institution
6464 in issuing bonds on the system's or institution's behalf. In
6565 connection with those issuances and with the issuance of refunding
6666 bonds on behalf of the system or those institutions, the authority
6767 is subject to all rights, duties, and conditions surrounding
6868 issuance previously applicable to the issuing system or institution
6969 under the statute authorizing the issuance. A reference in an
7070 authorizing statute to the system or institution on whose behalf
7171 the bonds are being issued applies equally to the authority in its
7272 capacity as issuer on behalf of the system or institution. An
7373 agreement under this subsection may provide for reimbursement to
7474 the authority for costs incurred in issuing bonds under the
7575 agreement.
7676 SECTION 4. Subchapter C, Chapter 1232, Government Code, is
7777 amended by adding Section 1232.1221 to read as follows:
7878 Sec. 1232.1221. COMMENCEMENT OF CERTAIN MULTIYEAR
7979 CANCER-RELATED PROJECTS. (a) Funds may be distributed to a grant
8080 recipient for a multiyear project for which an award is granted by
8181 the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight
8282 Committee as authorized by Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code,
8383 after the authority has certified that obligations in an amount
8484 sufficient to pay the money needed to fund the project have been
8585 authorized for issuance by the authority and approved by the Bond
8686 Review Board.
8787 (b) After issuing the obligations, the board shall:
8888 (1) pay the costs of the issuance and any related bond
8989 administrative costs of the authority;
9090 (2) certify to the Cancer Prevention and Research
9191 Institute of Texas and to the comptroller that the proceeds from the
9292 issuance are available; and
9393 (3) deposit the proceeds into the state treasury to be
9494 credited to the account of the Cancer Prevention and Research
9595 Institute of Texas.
9696 SECTION 5. Section 55.13(c), Education Code, is amended to
9797 read as follows:
9898 (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
9999 with respect to all bonds authorized to be issued by Midwestern
100100 State University[, Stephen F. Austin State University,] or Texas
101101 Southern University, the Texas Public Finance Authority shall
102102 exercise the authority of a board to issue bonds on behalf of those
103103 institutions, in the manner provided by this subchapter, including
104104 the authority to issue refunding bonds under Section 55.19. In
105105 connection with the issuance of bonds under this chapter, the Texas
106106 Public Finance Authority has all the rights and duties granted or
107107 assigned to and is subject to the same conditions as a board under
108108 this chapter.
109109 SECTION 6. Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, is
110110 amended to read as follows:
111111 Sec. 102.257. MULTIYEAR PROJECTS. The oversight committee
112112 may grant funds for a multiyear project. The oversight committee
113113 must specify the total amount of [All the] money approved [needed]
114114 to fund the [a] multiyear project. The total amount specified is
115115 considered for purposes of this subchapter to have been [must be]
116116 awarded in the state fiscal year that the project is approved by the
117117 research and prevention programs committee. The institute shall
118118 distribute only the money that will be expended during that fiscal
119119 year. The remaining money shall be [maintained in an escrow account
120120 to be] distributed by the institute as the money is needed in each
121121 subsequent fiscal year [years of the project].
122122 SECTION 7. (a) The changes in law made by this Act apply
123123 only to a grant of funds for a multiyear project by the Cancer
124124 Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee as
125125 authorized by Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, as amended
126126 by this Act, awarded on or after the effective date of this Act. A
127127 grant of funds for a multiyear project awarded before that date is
128128 governed by the law in effect on the date the grant was awarded, and
129129 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
130130 (b) The changes in law made by this Act to Section 55.13,
131131 Education Code, and Section 1232.101, Government Code, apply only
132132 to bonds authorized on or after the effective date of this Act.
133133 Bonds authorized before that date are governed by the law in effect
134134 on the date the bonds were authorized, and the former law is
135135 continued in effect for that purpose.
136136 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
137137 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
138138 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
139139 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
140140 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
141141 * * * * *