Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3813
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 18
|
Journal Page: 3813
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3813
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/12/11 5:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3727
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 18(a)
|
Journal Page: 3727
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 3727
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3727
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 354
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 354
|
House
|
11/09/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|