Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2312 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Coleman, Miles (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2312
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a sickle cell disease program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 33, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. SICKLE CELL DISEASE PROGRAM
 Sec. 33.051.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (2)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (3)  "Health and human services agency" means a health
 and human services agency listed by Section 531.001, Government
 Code.
 (4)  "Program" means the sickle cell disease program
 established under this subchapter.
 (5)  "Sickle cell disease" means any variant of sickle
 cell disease, including sickle cell anemia and sickle cell
 thalassemia.
 Sec. 33.052.  DUTIES OF DEPARTMENT. The department shall:
 (1)  identify efforts related to the expansion and
 coordination of education, treatment, and continuity of care
 programs for individuals with sickle cell trait and sickle cell
 disease;
 (2)  assist the advisory committee created under
 Section 33.053; and
 (3)  provide the advisory committee created under
 Section 33.053 with staff support necessary for the advisory
 committee to fulfill its duties.
 Sec. 33.053.  ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The governor shall
 appoint an advisory committee composed of 11 members, including a
 program administrator. The members must be located in
 geographically diverse areas of the state and must be interested in
 and knowledgeable about sickle cell trait and sickle cell disease.
 In making appointments to the advisory committee, the governor
 shall consider appointing members who are:
 (1)  representatives of a community agency;
 (2)  state or local officials responsible for public
 health, social services, or rehabilitation;
 (3)  representatives from educational institutions,
 including schools and universities;
 (4)  physicians and other health care providers; and
 (5)  persons with, or relatives of persons with, sickle
 cell trait or sickle cell disease.
 (b)  Members of the advisory committee serve staggered
 three-year terms, with the terms of three or four members expiring
 each year.
 (c)  The advisory committee shall meet at least twice a year.
 (d)  The advisory committee shall conduct a needs assessment
 and advise the department and the program administrator regarding
 the needs of individuals with sickle cell trait and sickle cell
 disease and make recommendations, including recommendations
 regarding legislative action, department rules, and program
 administration.
 (e)  The program administrator shall report periodically to
 the executive commissioner and annually to the governor regarding
 the advisory committee's activities and findings.
 (f)  A member of the advisory committee is not entitled to
 compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for travel or other
 expenses incurred while conducting the business of the advisory
 committee as provided by the General Appropriations Act.
 (g)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 advisory committee.
 Sec. 33.054.  GRANTS. (a) The program administrator shall
 investigate and identify grants and other funding mechanisms for
 entities that:
 (1)  provide education regarding sickle cell trait and
 sickle cell disease;
 (2)  improve the detection of sickle cell trait and
 sickle cell disease and the treatment of sickle cell disease;
 (3)  coordinate delivery of services for people with
 sickle cell disease;
 (4)  provide access to information regarding genetic
 testing and counseling;
 (5)  bundle technical services related to the
 prevention and treatment of sickle cell disease; and
 (6)  provide training for health professionals
 regarding sickle cell trait and sickle cell disease.
 (b)  The program administrator shall award grants, if
 possible, to eligible organizations in different regions of this
 state.
 (c)  The department may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations of money from the federal government, local governments,
 private corporations, and other persons to be used for the purpose
 of awarding grants under the program.
 Sec. 33.055.  RULES.  The executive commissioner may adopt
 rules to implement this subchapter.
 Sec. 33.056.  EXPIRATION.  This subchapter expires September
 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *